IL SB1187 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Right to Shop Act. Requires a carrier offering a health plan to develop and implement a program that provides incentives for enrollees in a health plan who elect to receive a comparable health care service from a provider that collects less than the average in-network allowed amount paid by that carrier to a network provider for that comparable health care service. Provides how incentives may be calculated, distributed, and offered. Requires the carrier to file a description of the health care service incentive program with the Department of Insurance. Requires a carrier to establish an interactive mechanism on its website to enable an enrollee to request the estimated amount the carrier would pay to a network provider for a comparable health care service. Requires the Director of Central Management Services to conduct an analysis on the cost effectiveness of implementing an incentive-based program for current enrollees and retirees of the State group health benefits plan. Requires a program found to be cost effective to be implemented as part of the next open enrollment. Effective immediately.
Title
RIGHT TO SHOP ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As June 23, 2020 |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 17, 2020 |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (IN) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. John F. Curran |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jim Oberweis |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1187&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1187.htm |