IL SB1150 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. Provides that the term "student" within the definition of "educational employee" or "employee" as used in the Act excludes (rather than includes) graduate students who are research assistants primarily performing duties that involve research, graduate assistants primarily performing duties that are pre-professional, graduate students who are teaching assistants primarily performing duties that involve the delivery and support of instruction, or any other graduate assistants. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ED LABOR ACT-STUDENT EMPLOYEE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-20SenatePostponed - Labor
2019-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Labor
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
2019-03-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-06SenatePostponed - Labor
2019-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Labor
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-05SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-05SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11552Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback