IL SB1147 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that each election precinct shall contain 1,200 voters (currently, 500 voters in counties, 600 voters in a municipality with a board of election commissioners and fewer than 500,000 inhabitants, or 400 voters in a municipality with a board of election commissioners and more than 500,000 inhabitants). Makes corresponding and other changes. In provisions concerning the county board of a county with less than 3,000,000 inhabitants, removes language providing that an election precinct with more than 600 voters may be divided. Provides that a county board may (rather than shall) at specified meetings, redivide, consolidate, or readjust (rather than redivide or readjust) election precincts to meet the 1,200 voters per precinct standard. In provisions concerning a municipality with a board of election commissioners, provides that a city with over 500,000 residents may (rather than shall) rearrange its precincts within 90 days of a presidential election or at any time when the number of votes cast exceeds 1,200 (rather than equals 600) to meet the 1,200 voters per precinct standard. Effective immediately.
Title
ELEC CD-ELEC PRECINCT NUMBERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Election Law |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 11-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 11-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1147&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1147.htm |