IL SB1139 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on October 28 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-11-24 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act of the Illinois Municipal Code. Extends the estimated date of completion of redevelopment projects and the retirement of obligations issued to finance redevelopment project costs for various ordinances adopted by the Village of Homer, City of Greenville, and City of Chicago. Creates a tax increment allocation financing extension to the 47th year (currently, the 35th year) after for various ordinances adopted by the City of Pekin and City of Belleville if those municipalities adopt a specified ordinance and provide notice to the taxing bodies that would otherwise constitute the joint review board of each redevelopment project area. Makes an organizational change. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TIF-REDEVELOPMENT PROJECT COST

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-24SenateSent to the Governor
2021-10-28SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-10-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
2021-10-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 3/5 Vote Required
2021-10-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
2021-10-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 3/5 Vote Required
2021-10-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
2021-10-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 3/5 Vote Required
2021-10-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2021-10-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2021-10-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2021-10-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2021-10-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-10-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Doris Turner
2021-10-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-10-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Doris Turner
2021-10-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-10-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Doris Turner
2021-10-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 - October 28, 2021
2021-10-28SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3
2021-10-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-003-000
2021-10-28House3/5 Vote Required
2021-10-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-10-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2021-10-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2021-10-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2021-10-28SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Doris Turner
2021-10-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2021-10-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2021-10-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2021-10-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2021-10-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2021-10-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-10-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2021-10-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 014-000-000
2021-10-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2021-10-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-10-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2021-10-25HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
2021-10-20HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-10-20HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-10-20HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-10-20HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-006-000
2021-10-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2021-10-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2021-10-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-10-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2021-10-14HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-05-15HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-05HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2021-05-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-05-04HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-30HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2021-04-30HouseArrived in House
2021-04-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2021-04-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Villivalam
2021-04-29SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2021-04-23SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
2021-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 010-000-000
2021-04-20SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ram Villivalam
2021-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2021-04-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
2021-03-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021
2021-03-25SenateSecond Reading
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021
2021-03-24SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2021-03-17SenateAssigned to Executive
2021-02-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-25SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-25SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
351710-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1139&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1139.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1139eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1139enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1139sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1139ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1139ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1139ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB1139_04292021_008000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200SB1139_10282021_011000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB1139ham003_10282021_011002C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB1139ham002_10282021_011001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB1139ham001_10282021_011000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback