IL SB1124 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Smoke-Free Campus Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EDUCATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2017-06-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-06-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2017-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2017-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2017-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2017-04-06SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
110641Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback