IL SB1110 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-09 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-09 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Intergovernmental Cooperation Act. Makes a technical change in a Section defining terms under the Act.
Title
GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 10, 2017 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 10, 2017 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 220 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |