IL SB1098 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0079
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0079
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the River Conservancy Districts Act. Provides that, in addition to the trustees appointed to the Saline Valley Conservancy District Board of Trustees, the mayor of each municipality with a population of 2,000 to 4,999 that purchases water from the District may appoint one member to the Board of Trustees beginning July 1, 2023 for a 5-year term, and the member shall serve until the trustee's successor is appointed and qualified or the municipality no longer purchases water from the District. Provides that a vacancy shall be filled by the mayor of the municipality for the remainder of the term. Effective immediately.
Title
LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0079 |
2023-06-09 | Senate | Effective Date June 9, 2023 |
2023-06-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000 |
2023-05-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 013-000-000 |
2023-04-18 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-31 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2023-03-31 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2023-03-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Fowler |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 010-000-000 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dale Fowler |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 60 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |