IL SB1096 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0034
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a health plan amended, delivered, issued, or renewed on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act shall provide coverage of diagnostic testing for enrollees that is performed by a testing provider in accordance with specified federal and State COVID-19 testing requirements, and that diagnostic testing for enrollees shall be considered medically necessary. Provides that a health plan may inquire as to whether an enrollee is an employee of the long-term care facility but shall not require further evidence or verification of the enrollee's employment status. Provides that the coverage requirements set forth in the provisions shall only apply when specified federal and State testing requirements are in effect. Provides that any failure to provide coverage of diagnostic testing pursuant to the provisions shall be deemed a failure to substantially comply with this Code. Provides that the provisions are repealed on January 1, 2022. Defines terms. Makes corresponding changes in the Health Maintenance Organization Act. Repeals the COVID-19 Medically Necessary Diagnostic Testing Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS CD-COVID-19 TESTING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-25SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0034
2021-06-25SenateEffective Date June 25, 2021
2021-06-25SenateGovernor Approved
2021-06-15SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2021-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
2021-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2021-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ann Gillespie
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 27, 2021
2021-05-26SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2021-05-26HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000
2021-05-21HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
2021-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva Dina Delgado
2021-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-13HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-13HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-12HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-12HouseDo Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Human Services Committee; 014-000-000
2021-05-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2021-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2021-05-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris
2021-05-05HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2021-05-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-05-04HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-30HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris
2021-04-30HouseArrived in House
2021-04-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2021-04-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Gillespie
2021-04-29SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2021-04-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000
2021-04-23SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
2021-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2021-04-23SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ann Gillespie
2021-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie
2021-03-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021
2021-03-25SenateSecond Reading
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021
2021-03-24SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2021-03-17SenateAssigned to Executive
2021-02-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-25SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-25SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
210421Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1096&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1096.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1096eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1096enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/102/102-0034.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1096sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1096ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB1096_04292021_007000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200SB1096_05262021_006037T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB1096ham001_05312021_001000C.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback