IL SB1073 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0458
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0458
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning enforcement of the Code.
Title
CIVIL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-19 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0458 |
2011-08-19 | Senate | Effective Date August 19, 2011 |
2011-08-19 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-048-001 |
2011-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2011-05-13 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 20, 2011 |
2011-05-11 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-05-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-04 | House | First Reading |
2011-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2011-05-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-011-000 |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Wilhelmi |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 4, 2011 |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-001-003 |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2011-04-05 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi |
2011-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 1-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |