IL SB1055 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-08 - Assigned to Executive Committee
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-08 - Assigned to Executive Committee
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Makes a technical change in provisions concerning venue.
Title
EMINENT DOMAIN-BRIDGEVIEW
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-08 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2010-12-08 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 11, 2011 | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-18 | First Reading | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-18 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski | |
2010-03-18 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-18 | Third Reading - Passed; 044-012-001 | |
2010-03-18 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Edward D. Maloney | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Viverito | |
2010-03-18 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 007-002-001 | |
2010-03-12 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Louis S. Viverito | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 11, 2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Approved for Consideration Assignments | |
2010-02-18 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Louis S. Viverito | |
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 28, 2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000 | |
2009-03-05 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-06 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |