IL SB1033 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |