IL SB1002 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]


Amends the Election Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the nomination of candidates for the General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.





2017-10-10SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-04-25SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1058-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

Bill Comments