IL SB0989 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-10-03 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Salaries Act. Makes a technical change in the Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-09-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
2017-08-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on the Constitution and Redistricting Issues
2017-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2017-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-03-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2017-03-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-03-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-03-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-03-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-03-23SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
52900.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback