IL SB0982 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that no candidate for President or Vice-President of the United States shall appear on the official ballot for the general election if that candidate has not released his or her tax returns at least 5 days prior to the date set for certification of the ballot for the general election. Defines "released his or her tax returns" to mean that the tax returns filed with the federal Internal Revenue Service for the 5 most recent years in which tax returns have been filed by the candidates for President and Vice-President of the United States have been filed with the Secretary of State. Requires the Secretary of State to post the tax returns on the Secretary of State's website and to certify that the tax returns have been filed to the State Board of Elections. Allows the Secretary of State to adopt rules to implement the provisions.
Title
ELEC CD-PRESIDENT-TAX RETURNS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 32 N: 19 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-01-06 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-04-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 032-019-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 009-004-000 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported Back To Executive; 002-001-000 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2017-03-01 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Election Law |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 21-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |