IL SB0974 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Oil and Gas Wells on Public Lands Act. Provides that on and after the effective date of the amendatory Act, no new permits shall be issued for surface extraction activities on lands owned by the Department of Natural Resources or the federal government. Prohibits the Department of Natural Resources from entering into contracts in writing designating any person as the permittee of the State of Illinois with the exclusive right to prospect and explore public lands of the State of Illinois for the occurrence of petroleum. Repeals provisions governing certain petroleum leases, right of way over public lands, and preferential rights to prospecting permits. Effective immediately.
Title
OIL & GAS-PERMIT MORATORIUM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 615 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 17 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 18 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 21 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=974&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0974.htm |