IL SB0966 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Aeronautics Act. Makes a technical change in a Section regarding landing areas.
Title
TRANSPORTATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 26, 2012 |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2012 |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2011-07-23 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 4, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
620 | 5 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=966&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB0966.htm |