IL SB0959 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0595
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0595
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Toll Highway Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning powers of the Toll Highway Authority.
Title
VEH CD-SUPPORTING SHIPPER
Sponsors
Sen. Martin Sandoval [D] | Sen. Mike Jacobs [D] | Rep. Maria Berrios [D] | Rep. Derrick Smith [D] |
Rep. Edward Acevedo [D] | Rep. Luis Arroyo [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-29 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 94 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 94 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0595 |
2011-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date August 26, 2011 |
2011-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-29 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 042-000-001 |
2011-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Transportation; 009-000-000 |
2011-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Transportation |
2011-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2011 |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2011-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 094-020-002 |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2011-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-05-26 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2011-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
2011-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 015-000-000 |
2011-05-13 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 20, 2011 |
2011-05-12 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2011-05-11 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2011-05-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-05 | House | First Reading |
2011-05-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2011-05-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-002 |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sandoval |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 4, 2011 |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 10 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |