IL SB0957 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-6-1)
Status: Passed on January 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning persons that are not to be granted a license or permit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TRANSPORTATION-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-01-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-28SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1157
2013-01-28SenateEffective Date November 28, 2013
2013-01-28SenateGovernor Approved
2013-01-24SenateSent to the Governor
2013-01-08SenatePassed Both Houses
2013-01-08HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-046-000
2013-01-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2013-01-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson
2013-01-08HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2013-01-08HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Filed
2013-01-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2013-01-08HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2013-01-08HouseHome Rule Note Filed
2013-01-08HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr.
2013-01-08HouseBalanced Budget Note Filed
2013-01-08HouseJudicial Note Filed
2013-01-08HousePension Note Filed
2013-01-08HouseFiscal Note Filed
2013-01-07HouseState Debt Impact Note Filed
2013-01-07HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
2013-01-07HouseCorrectional Note Filed
2013-01-07HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
2013-01-07HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
2013-01-07HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Luis Arroyo
2013-01-07HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2013-01-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott E. Penny
2013-01-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2013-01-07HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2013-01-07HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2013-01-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2013-01-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2013-01-07HouseState Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr.
2013-01-07HouseJudicial Note Requested by Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr.
2013-01-07HouseHome Rule Note Requested by Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr.
2013-01-07HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr.
2013-01-07HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr.
2013-01-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2013-01-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 006-003-000
2012-12-05HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelo Saviano
2012-12-05HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2012-12-05HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2012-12-05HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cory Foster
2012-12-05HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 8, 2013
2012-12-05HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2012-12-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2012-12-04HouseFirst Reading
2012-12-04HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo
2012-12-04HouseArrived in House
2012-12-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2012-12-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 041-014-001
2012-12-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2012-12-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Johnson
2012-12-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2012-12-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Millner
2012-12-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Cullerton
2012-12-04SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2012-12-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2012-12-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ron Sandack
2012-11-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland
2012-11-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2012-11-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Mu
2012-11-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Millner
2012-11-30SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Michael Noland
2012-11-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno
2012-11-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2012-11-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2012-11-29SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Linda Holmes
2012-11-29SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Terry Link
2012-11-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2012-11-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 012-002-000
2012-11-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 012-002-000
2012-11-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
2012-11-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
2012-11-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
2012-11-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2012-11-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Millner
2012-11-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady
2012-11-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2012-11-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2012-11-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2012-11-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2012-11-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2012-11-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2012-11-27SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
2012-11-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2012-11-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2012-11-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2012-11-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland
2012-11-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As January 8, 2013
2012-11-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2012-11-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 28, 2012
2012-11-27SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2011-07-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)
2011-07-23SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2011-04-15SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 4, 2011
2011-04-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation
2011-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2011-04-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2011-04-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2011-03-31SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2011-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2011
2011-03-17SenateSecond Reading
2011-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2011
2011-03-17SenateDo Pass Executive; 015-000-000
2011-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2011-02-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2011-02-08SenateFirst Reading
2011-02-08SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62556-103Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback