IL SB0954 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Railroad Incorporation Act. Makes a technical change in a provision concerning articles of incorporation.
Title
VEH CD-FINANCIAL RESPONSIBILTY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2011-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 010-001-000 |
2011-04-25 | House | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2011-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 038-012-001 |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Sullivan |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 007-001-002 |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2011 |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2011 |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 011-000-000 |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Held in Transportation |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
610 | 5 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |