IL SB0951 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Provides that notice to parties in a contested case under the Act shall be served, among other forms of service, by electronic mail. Provides that parties in a contested case under the Act shall be notified, among other forms of notification, by electronic mail of any decision or order in that case. Provides that an agency may require all attorneys to designate an electronic mail address to which all documents required under certain specified Sections may be transmitted. Provides that if an attorney is required to designate an electronic mail address, he or she must designate one primary electronic mail address, and may designate no more than 2 secondary electronic mail addresses. Provides that an agency may request, but not require, an unrepresented party to designate an electronic mail address to which all documents required under certain specified Sections may be transmitted. Allows an agency to, by rule, make electronic mail the default option for service of documents. Provides that service by electronic mail is complete on the first business day following transmission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURE-EMAIL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-18HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-05-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-17HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-17HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-05-16HouseArrived in House
2017-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Oberweis
2017-05-16SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Judiciary
2017-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jim Oberweis
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 011-000-000
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jim Oberweis
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jim Oberweis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
510010-25Amended CodeCitation Text
510010-50Amended CodeCitation Text
510010-75New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback