IL SB0949 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Common Interest Community Association Act and the Condominium Property Act. Provides that if the condominium or community instruments require approval of any mortgagee or lienholder of record and the mortgagee or lienholder of record receives a request to approve or consent to the amendment to the condominium or community instruments, the mortgagee or lienholder of record is deemed to have approved or consented to the request unless the mortgagee or lienholder of record delivers a negative response to the requesting party within 35 days after the mailing of the request.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONDO/CICAA: BYLAWS-LIENHOLDER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi
2017-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi
2017-05-10HouseTo Civil Procedure Subcommittee
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-001
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 010-000-001
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7651601-20Amended CodeCitation Text
76560527Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback