IL SB0948 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Common Interest Community Association Act. Provides that each member of a common interest community association shall receive through a prescribed delivery method, at least 25 (instead of 30) days but not more than 60 days prior to the adoption by the board, a copy of the proposed annual budget. Makes a similar change in the Condominium Property Act. Further amends the Condominium Property Act. Replaces language specifying when a portion of a noticed board meeting may be closed with language providing that the board may close any portion of a noticed meeting or meet separately from a noticed meeting to: (A) discuss litigation when an action against or on behalf of the particular association has been filed and is pending in a court or administrative tribunal, or when the board of managers finds that such an action is probable or imminent; (B) discuss the appointment, employment, engagement, or dismissal of an employee, independent contractor, agent, or other provider of goods and services; (C) interview a potential employee, independent contractor, agent, or other provider of goods and services; (D) discuss violations of rules and regulations of the association; (E) discuss a unit owner's unpaid share of common expenses; or (F) consult with the association's legal counsel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONDO/CICAA: BUDGETS; MEETINGS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-06HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017
2017-06-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-06-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2017-06-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-06-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-28HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-06-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 006-003-000
2017-06-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-06-28HouseRemains in Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-06-28HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 002-001-000
2017-06-27HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-06-27HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Civil Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-06-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-06-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi
2017-06-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-06-24HouseTo Civil Procedure Subcommittee
2017-06-24HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-05-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-05-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-10HouseTo Civil Procedure Subcommittee
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-001
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017
2017-03-01SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 010-000-001
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7651601-45Amended CodeCitation Text
76560518.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback