IL SB0944 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Taxi Safety Act of 2007. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LICENSE PLATES-MOTORCYCLES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2019-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Transportation; 017-000-000
2019-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Transportation
2019-05-22SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-22SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 23, 2019
2019-05-22SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2019-05-15HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Amy Grant
2019-05-15HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Amy Grant
2019-05-14HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 010-000-000
2019-05-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2019-05-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin
2019-05-02HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2019-05-01HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 011-000-000
2019-04-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
2019-04-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin
2019-04-24HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2019-04-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-04HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-04HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2019-04-04HouseArrived in House
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2019-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Anderson
2019-03-28SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-03-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 018-000-000
2019-03-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2019-03-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-03-14SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2019-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625551Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=944&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0944.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0944eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0944enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0944sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0944ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0944ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0944_04042019_025000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB0944_05212019_032000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0944ham002_05312019_031000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback