IL SB0930 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Eastern Illinois University Law. Extends the repeal of the tuition affordability discount program from July 1, 2022 to July 1, 2026. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EIU-TUITION DISCOUNT PROGRAM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-16SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-05-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2017-05-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 015-000-000
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-001
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017
2017-03-01SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 011-000-000
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11066510-92Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback