IL SB0920 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0523
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0523
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Creates the Illinois Forensic Science Commission and provides for membership and duties for the commission. Provides for reporting by publicly funded forensic laboratories of non-conformities with the efficient delivery of forensic services. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides for notification by the State's Attorney to forensic laboratories under specified circumstances. Amends the Sexual Assault Evidence Submission Act. Provides that the Department of State Police may, rather than shall, develop rules to implement a sexual assault evidence tracking system. Makes other changes. Adds an immediate effective date provision.
Title
FORENSIC LAB IMPACT NOTE ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0523 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date August 20, 2021 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Police & Fire Committee; 014-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Police & Fire Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Van Pelt |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Van Pelt |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 377 | 10-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |