IL SB0915 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Township Code. Provides that a county may restructure from a county board into a commission form of government after discontinuing township organization on or before 180 days after the township organization ceases (currently, a county is required to reorganize into a commission form of government). Provides that 2 or more townships which share a boundary may consolidate into one township after a referendum is approved by a majority of voters in both townships. Provides for the merging of one township into 2 other townships. Provides that all townships (currently, only allowed in specified townships) within a coterminous, or substantially coterminous, municipality may dissolve into the municipality. Amends the Election Code. Provides that referenda submitted under specified Articles of the Township Code regarding consolidation, merger, and discontinuance of townships may be submitted for a vote at an election regardless of the number of other referenda on the ballot. Specifies procedures for township consolidation, merger, and discontinuance referenda. Makes other conforming changes. Amends the Counties Code making conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
TWP CONSOLIDATE MERGE DISSOLVE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 28-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 3-7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 2-4006 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | Div. 2-4 heading | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 22-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 22-15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 22-20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 22-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 23-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 23-15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 23-20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 23-25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 23-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 25-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 25-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 29-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 29-15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 29-20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 29-25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 29-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 65-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | Art. 22 heading | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | Art. 23 heading | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | Art. 29 heading | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=915&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0915.htm |