IL SB0899 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0419
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0419
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Accounting Act. Allows a certified public accountant (CPA) firm whose principal place of business is not in this State to have all the privileges of a CPA firm licensed under the Act without the need to obtain a license from the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation or to file notice with the Department if the CPA firm complies with specified substantial equivalency requirements; makes conforming changes. Provides that firms that do not meet the certain requirements but offer or render services in the State must hold a license issued under the Act. Provides that every application for renewal of a license by a licensed CPA who has been licensed under the Act for 3 years of more shall be accompanied or supported by evidence showing the completion of professional education as prescribed by Department rule (rather than showing the completion of 120 hours of continuing professional education each 3 years as prescribed by Department rule) and makes related changes. Effective immediately.
Title
ACCOUNTANTS-EQUIVALENCY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0419 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Effective Date August 25, 2017 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-000-000 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2017 |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 087-022-000 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-05-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-05-03 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 450 | 0.03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 450 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 450 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 450 | 5.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |