IL SB0888 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Postponed - Higher Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Community College Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Illinois Community College Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMMUNITY COLL-NURSING DEGREE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Postponed - Higher Education
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Higher Education
2017-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2017-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2017-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2017-05-03SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass as Amended Higher Education; 007-006-000
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2017-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2017-03-07SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1108052-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback