IL SB0859 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Creates the Office of Economic Equity and Empowerment within the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity. Provides that the Office shall assist minority-owned businesses, women-owned businesses, veteran-owned businesses, businesses owned by persons with disabilities, eligible not-for-profit corporations, and other underserved communities and constituencies through targeted programs, resources, and outreach and promotional activities. Provides that the Office may engage in or conduct certain activities in support of minority-owned businesses, women-owned businesses, veteran-owned businesses, businesses owned by persons with disabilities, eligible not-for-profit corporations, and other underserved communities. Authorizes the Office to use vendors or enter into contracts to carry out its purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 86 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-20SenateSent to the Governor
2024-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2024-05-22SenatePassed Both Houses
2024-05-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 086-023-000
2024-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
2024-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2024-05-17HouseThird Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
2024-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2024-05-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2024-05-02HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2024-05-01HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee; 005-002-000
2024-04-24HouseAssigned to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee
2024-04-16HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kam Buckner
2024-04-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2024-04-15HouseFirst Reading
2024-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
2024-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
2024-04-12HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
2024-04-12HouseArrived in House
2024-04-12SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-003-000
2024-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2024-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2024-04-12SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2024-04-09SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Celina Villanueva
2024-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2024-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2024-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva
2024-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2024
2024-03-20SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2023-03-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2023-03-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
2023-03-10SenateSecond Reading
2023-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
2023-03-09SenateDo Pass Executive; 011-000-000
2023-03-02SenateAssigned to Executive
2023-02-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2023-02-02SenateFirst Reading
2023-02-02SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
205051.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback