IL SB0858 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Safe and Hygienic Bed Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning definitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HEALTH-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-08SenateSession Sine Die
2011-07-23SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2011-04-15SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 4, 2011
2011-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2011
2011-03-17SenateSecond Reading
2011-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2011
2011-03-17SenateDo Pass Executive; 015-000-000
2011-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2011-02-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2011-02-08SenateFirst Reading
2011-02-08SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
410685Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback