IL SB0849 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. In provisions concerning tax objections based on budget or appropriation ordinances, provides that no objection to any property tax levied by any municipality or county (rather than by any municipality) shall be sustained by any court under certain conditions. Removes forest preserve districts having a population of 3,000,000 or more from the definition of "municipality" in those provisions. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-OBJECTIONS-COUNTIES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-05-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-05-03HouseArrived in House
2017-05-03SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2017
2017-02-22SenateDo Pass Revenue; 007-000-000
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520023-35Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback