IL SB0845 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, in Cook County, all applications for judgment and order of sale for taxes and special assessments on delinquent properties shall be made (i) by April 1, 2017 for tax year 2015, and (ii) by March 1 of the second calendar year after the applicable tax year for tax year 2016 and thereafter (currently, by May 1, 2016 for tax year 2014, by March 1, 2017 for tax year 2015, and within 90 days after the second installment due date for tax year 2016 and each tax year thereafter). Makes changes concerning the indemnity fee. Provides that the fee shall be adjusted annually beginning on February 1, 2023. Provides that the court may not declare a sale in error solely based on an error of the assessor, chief county assessment officer, board of review, board of appeals, or other county official if the court finds that the error is immaterial. In provisions that require the court to declare a sale in error in the case of a voluntary or involuntary petition under the provisions of the federal Bankruptcy Code of 1978, provides that the petition must be pending on the date of the application for judgment and order of sale or the date of the tax sale. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TAX-APPLY FOR JUDGMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-04-06SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-16SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-02-22SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520021-150Amended CodeCitation Text
3520021-295Amended CodeCitation Text
3520021-305Amended CodeCitation Text
3520021-310Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback