IL SB0815 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 1 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Reinserts the contents of the engrossed bill with changes. Adds to the membership of the Commission on Equitable Public University Funding. Makes conforming and other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMMISSION EQUITABLE UNIV FUND

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 39 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 39 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 39 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30SenateSent to the Governor
2021-06-01SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-06-01Senate3/5 Vote Required
2021-06-01SenateSenate Concurs
2021-06-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 039-017-000
2021-06-01SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 039-017-000
2021-06-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Senate Concurs 039-017-000
2021-06-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 3/5 Vote Required
2021-06-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 3/5 Vote Required
2021-06-01SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 3/5 Vote Required
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2021-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2021-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2021-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3, 4 - May 31, 2021
2021-05-31SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3, 4
2021-05-31HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-046-000
2021-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
2021-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2021-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 010-000-000
2021-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
2021-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 006-004-000
2021-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
2021-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-05-29HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2021-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 006-004-000
2021-05-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote
2021-05-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-05-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
2021-05-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2021-05-26HouseSuspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 071-043-000
2021-05-26HouseMoved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Greg Harris
2021-05-26HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2021-05-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-05-25HouseFirst Reading
2021-05-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-05-25HouseArrived in House
2021-05-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2021-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2021-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 040-018-000
2021-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2021-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Lightford
2021-05-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2021-05-21SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2021
2021-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-006-000
2021-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
2021-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
2021-05-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2021-05-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2021-05-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021
2021-04-30SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021
2021-04-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
2021-04-23SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
2021-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Executive
2021-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments
2021-04-20SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2021-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 To Appropriations- Higher Education
2021-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations
2021-04-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2021-03-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021
2021-03-25SenateSecond Reading
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021
2021-03-24SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2021-03-17SenateAssigned to Executive
2021-02-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-25SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-25SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=815&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0815.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0815eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0815enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0815sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0815sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0815ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0815ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0815ham003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0815ham004.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB0815_05252021_025000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200SB0815_05312021_009000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB0815ham004_05312021_049002C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB0815ham003_05312021_049001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB0815ham001_05312021_049000C.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback