IL SB0804 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Passed on August 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0265
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Passed on August 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0265
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that a court services fee shall not exceed $25 unless the fee is set according to an acceptable cost study under the Code.
Title
CNTY CD-COURT SERVICES FEE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 48 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-04 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0265 |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 063-048-003 |
2015-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2015-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2015-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2015-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2015-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2015-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2015-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2015-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2015-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2015-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 010-001-000 |
2015-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2015-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2015-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2015-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-04-20 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-14 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2015-03-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 032-017-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2015 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-003-000 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-1103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |