IL SB0803 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1141
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1141
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children's Privacy Protection and Parental Empowerment Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning information brokers.
Title
CHILDREN-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1141 |
2014-12-30 | Senate | Effective Date December 30, 2014 |
2014-12-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-12-02 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2014-12-02 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-12-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-12-01 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-12-01 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-12-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-12-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2014-11-25 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2014-11-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-11-25 | House | First Reading |
2014-11-20 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2014-11-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 043-003-000 |
2014-11-20 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hunter |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 006-000-000 |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 4, 2014 |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2014-11-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-11-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2014-11-14 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 19, 2014 |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
325 | 17 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |