IL SB0785 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0206
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0206
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Exempts certain health care professionals licensed to practice in another state or country from State licensure requirements if the professional is practicing in the State while under contract to provide services to an athletic team. Defines "athletic team". Limits the services the health care professional may provide. Limits the licensing exemption period to 10 days per sporting event. Authorizes the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation to grant one 20-day extension to the exemption period. Provides that an exempt health care professional is not authorized to practice at a health care clinic or facility. Effective September 1, 2015.
Title
TEAM PHYSICIANS-EXEMPTIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0206 |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Effective Date September 1, 2015 |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2015-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000 |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015 |
2015-05-04 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2015-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2015 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |