IL SB0778 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Freedom of Information Act. In a provision establishing exemptions for disclosure under the Act, excludes from those exemptions the text of an agreement to invest in a private equity fund, hedge fund, or absolute return fund that is proposed or executed after January 1, 2018 and any modification to or amendment of such an agreement that modifies or alters any of the provisions. Provides that trade secrets in the text of the agreement are not subject to disclosure under the Act. Defines terms. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOIA-PENSION INVESTMENTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 012-000-000
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-16SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-16SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-01SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-01SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51407Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback