IL SB0777 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Utilities Act. Modifies the requirements for an application for a certificate of public convenience and necessity for the construction of new high voltage electric service lines and related facilities (Project). Provides that an applicant must provide and identify a proposed primary right-of-way and one or more alternate rights-of-way for the Project at the first public meeting held in each county. Requires that the public be provided the opportunity to comment on the proposed primary and alternate rights-of-way. Requires notice of the time and place scheduled for the public meeting to be provided by registered mail to each owner of record of land included in the proposed primary and alternate rights-of-way over which the utility seeks to construct a high-voltage electric line. Provides that for applications filed after the effective date of this amendatory Act, certificates granted for Projects that will impact agricultural land shall be conditioned on the applicant adhering to an agricultural impact mitigation agreement that he or she has entered into with the Department of Agriculture that outlines the mitigative actions the applicant will take to preserve the integrity of agricultural land impacted by the Project. Provides that if a public utility seeks relief to exercise eminent domain power to make necessary alterations, additions, extensions, or improvements ordered or authorized under certain specified Sections after the Commission enters its order in a proceeding for a certificate of public convenience and necessity for a Project, the Commission shall issue its order within 180 (rather than 45) days after the utility files its petition seeking relief. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUB UTILITIES-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Energy and Public Utilities; 010-000-000
2017-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Energy and Public Utilities
2017-02-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-01SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-01SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22058-406.1Amended CodeCitation Text
22058-509Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback