IL SB0775 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Higher Education Student Online Personal Information Protection Act. Provides that the operator of an Internet website, online service, online application, or mobile application used primarily for higher education purposes and designed and marketed for higher education purposes shall not knowingly (1) engage in targeted advertising on the operator's site, service, or application or target advertising on any other site, service, or application when the targeting of the advertising is based upon any information that the operator has acquired because of the use of that operator's site, service, or application; (2) use information created or gathered by the operator's site, service, or application to amass a profile about a student, except in furtherance of higher education purposes; (3) sell a student's information; or (4) disclose covered information, as defined in the Act, without a student's consent. Sets forth exceptions and other provisions concerning the construction and application of the Act. Effective January 1, 2016.
Title
STUDENT ONLINE PERSONAL INFO
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=775&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0775.htm |