IL SB0771 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-07-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Illinois Speech-Language Pathology and Audiology Practice Act from January 1, 2018 to January 1, 2028. Amends the Illinois Speech-Language Pathology and Audiology Practice Act. Provides that all applicants and licensees shall provide a valid address and email address, which shall serve as the address and email address of record, and shall inform the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation of any change of address or email address through specified means. Provides provisions concerning confidentiality of information collected by the Department in the course of an examination or investigation. Makes changes in provisions concerning definitions, the Board of Speech-Language Pathology and Audiology, grounds for discipline of license, investigations, notices, hearings, appointment of a hearing officer, restoration of a license, certification of records, and the application of the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Removes provisions concerning a roster of speech-language pathologists and audiologists. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SPEECH PATH PRACTICE-VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - Motion in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-28SenateSent to the Governor
2017-07-01SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-07-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 048-000-000
2017-07-01Senate3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000
2017-06-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-06-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-06-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-06-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - June 30, 2017
2017-06-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2017-06-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2017-06-29House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
2017-06-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Table Amendment - Prevailed
2017-06-29HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-29HouseMotion Prevailed 109-000-000
2017-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-05-31HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2017-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-30HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-05-03HouseArrived in House
2017-05-03SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Martinez
2017-05-03SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-16SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-01SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-01SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22511010Repealed CodeCitation Text
22511016Amended CodeCitation Text
22511017Amended CodeCitation Text
22511022Amended CodeCitation Text
22511023Amended CodeCitation Text
22511024.1Amended CodeCitation Text
2251103Amended CodeCitation Text
22511034Amended CodeCitation Text
22511034.1New CodeSee Bill Text
2251104.5New CodeSee Bill Text
2251105Amended CodeCitation Text
2251108.5Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.28Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.38New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=771&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0771.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0771eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0771enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0771sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0771sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0771ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0771ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0771_05032017_008000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB0771_05302017_066000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB0771_06292017_023000M.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB0771_06292017_024000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0771_07012017_003000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback