IL SB0763 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Legislative Youth Advisory Council Act. Provides that the purpose of the Council is to facilitate communication between the youth of the State of Illinois and the elected branches of State government regarding the issues, interests, and needs important to youth in the State of Illinois. Creates an Advisory Board, consisting of 2 members of the House of Representatives, one each appointed by the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the Minority Leader of the House of Representatives; and 2 members of the Senate, one each appointed by the President of the Senate and the Minority Leader of the Senate, to facilitate the functions of the Council. Provides for the application and nomination process for prospective members of the Council. Sets forth membership and meeting requirements and the powers of the Council. Provides that members of the Council shall serve one-year terms, but may be re-elected if they continue to be nominated and qualified to serve as members. Provides for the election of a President, Secretary, Treasurer, and Clerk at the first Council meeting of the year. Requires the Council to submit an annual report to the General Assembly and the Governor. Creates the Illinois Legislative Youth Advisory Council Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Provides that all moneys in the Fund shall be used to reimburse Council members for actual expenses incurred in traveling to Council meetings, including travel, food, and lodging, and printing the annual report. Amends the State Finance Act. Adds the Illinois Legislative Youth Advisory Council Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
YOUTH ADVISORY COUNCIL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 005-001-001 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |