IL SB0757 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0222
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. With respect to requiring the scores attained by a student on the State assessment that includes a college and career ready determination to be entered on the student's transcript, provides that these scores must be removed from the student's transcript if the student's parent or legal guardian requests such removal. Makes a related change. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-ST ASSESSMENT-TRANSCRPT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-18SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0222
2017-08-18SenateEffective Date August 18, 2017
2017-08-18SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-22SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-26SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000
2017-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-18HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-05-03HouseArrived in House
2017-05-03SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison
2017-05-03SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 009-000-000
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2017
2017-03-14SenateSecond Reading
2017-02-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2017
2017-02-16SenateDo Pass Education; 009-000-000
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Education
2017-02-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-01SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-01SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.64a-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback