IL SB0736 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Educational Credit for Military Experience Act. Provides that before June 1, 2018, each institution of higher education shall adopt a policy regarding its awarding of academic credit for military training considered applicable to the requirements of the student's certificate or degree program. Requires the policy to apply to any individual who is enrolled in the institution of higher education and who has completed a military training course that meets certain requirements. Provides that institutions of higher education shall develop procedures for evaluating courses and awarding credit. Requires institutions of higher education to submit their policies for awarding credit to the Board of Higher Education and the Illinois Community College Board for review before June 30, 2018 and before June 30 of every other year thereafter. Requires the Board of Higher Education to collect data in the Illinois Higher Education Information System on students who are veterans or have military service to assess enrollment and completions outcomes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGHER ED-MILITARY EXP CREDIT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-04HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-04-25HouseArrived in House
2017-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2017
2017-03-14SenateSecond Reading
2017-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-02-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-02-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2017
2017-02-16SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 011-000-000
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2017-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback