IL SB0734 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Finance Article of the Illinois Municipal Code. Revises the definition of "financial institution" to mean any bank, savings bank, savings and loan association, or credit union established under the laws of the United States, the State, or any other state; or any regional planning commissions or joint regional planning commissions union established under specified provisions (rather than any bank subject to the Illinois Banking Act, any savings and loan association subject to the Illinois Savings and Loan Act of 1985, any federally chartered commercial bank or savings and loan association organized and operated in this State pursuant to the laws of the United States, and any regional planning commissions or joint regional planning commissions union). Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI CD-FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS
Sponsors
Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Rep. Louis Lang [D] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-08-13 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 45 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 45 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 45 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | Total Veto Stands |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto January 31, 2018 |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2017-08-13 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 045-006-001 |
2017-08-13 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-08-13 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-08-04 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-06-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 005-002-000 |
2017-06-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government |
2017-06-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2017-06-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. David Koehler |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-05-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 063-045-000 |
2017-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 008-000-000 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 8-1-3.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |