IL SB0731 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Third Reading - Standard Debate - Lost 042-072-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Third Reading - Standard Debate - Lost 042-072-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nurse Practice Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning a licensed practical nurse's scope of practice.
Title
HOSPITAL LICENSURE FUND-FEE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 42 N: 72 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Lost 042-072-000 | |
2010-04-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate | |
2010-04-29 | Second Reading - Standard Debate | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate | |
2010-04-28 | Do Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Human Services Committee; 004-003-000 | |
2010-04-28 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-04-28 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Human Services Committee | |
2010-04-23 | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2010 | |
2010-04-19 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2010-04-19 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-04-19 | First Reading | |
2010-04-16 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-04-16 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers | |
2010-04-16 | Arrived in House | |
2010-04-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2010-04-15 | Third Reading - Passed; 033-016-000 | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2010-04-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Delgado | |
2010-04-15 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2010-03-26 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 15, 2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 007-002-000 | |
2010-03-23 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health | |
2010-03-19 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As March 26, 2010 | |
2010-03-19 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-19 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William Delgado | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William Delgado | |
2010-03-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2010 | |
2010-03-15 | Approved for Consideration Assignments | |
2010-03-12 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William Delgado | |
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 28, 2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000 | |
2009-03-05 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-06 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |