IL SB0730 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0220
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0220
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal of the Illinois Petroleum Education and Marketing Act from January 1, 2018 to January 1, 2028. Amends the Illinois Petroleum Education and Marketing Act. Removes language providing for the expiration of the Illinois Petroleum Resources Board. Effective immediately.
Title
SUNSET-PETROL EDUC
Sponsors
Sen. Dale Righter [R] | Rep. Dave Severin [R] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Rep. David Reis [R] |
Rep. Brandon Phelps [D] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. John Cavaletto [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0220 |
2017-08-18 | Senate | Effective Date August 18, 2017 |
2017-08-18 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-001-000 |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-17 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-05-16 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-05-15 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Righter |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Energy and Public Utilities; 009-000-000 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 010-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 728 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.38 | New Code | See Bill Text |