IL SB0717 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an addition modification in an amount equal to the deduction for qualified domestic production activities allowed under Section 199 of the Internal Revenue Code for the taxable year. Makes changes concerning the definition of "unitary business group". Provides that those moneys shall be deposited into the Bill Payment Trust Fund. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
REVENUE-BILL PAYMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015 |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 007-004-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.866 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 1501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |