IL SB0709 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that it shall be unlawful for any person to trap or to hunt with gun, dog, dog and gun, or bow and arrow, gray fox, red fox, raccoon, weasel, mink, muskrat, badger, bobcat, and opossum except during the open season which will be set annually by the Director to start between 12:01 a.m., November 1 and 12:00 midnight on November 10, and close no earlier than 12:00 midnight on February 15 but not later than 12:00 midnight on March 31, with start and close dates both inclusive (rather than between 12:01 a.m., November 1 to 12:00 midnight February 15, both inclusive). Deletes a provision providing that the season limit for river otter shall not exceed 5 river otters per person per season. Provides that any person who violates the provisions of the Section, including administrative rules, shall be guilty of a Class B misdemeanor.
Title
WILDLIFE-OPEN HUNT SEASONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Agriculture; 004-006-000 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Agriculture |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Re-assigned to Agriculture |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 2.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |