IL SB0696 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Director of Corrections may transfer persons committed to the Department other than addicts, alcoholics, or intoxicated persons who may be subject to involuntary admission or who meets the standards of judicial admission to any psychiatric unit of any public or private hospital for observation, diagnosis, and treatment, subject to the approval of the hospital, for a period of not more than 6 months, if the person consents in writing to the transfer. Establishes procedures in which the Director of Corrections may petition the circuit court requesting transfer to the hospital if the person objects or does not consent to his or her transfer. Provides that no person may be transferred under this provision unless the Department of Corrections determines in writing that the psychiatric unit to which the person will be transferred can provide a safe and secure environment for that person. Provides that the public or private hospital shall return to the Department of Corrections any person committed to it under this provision, whose sentence has not expired and whom the hospital deems no longer subject to involuntary admission, or no longer meets the standard for judicial admission. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall notify the director of any hospital of the expiration of the sentence of any person transferred to that hospital under this provision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-TRANSFER PSYCH TREAT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-04-07SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenatePostponed - Human Services
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenatePostponed - Human Services
2017-03-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73053-8-5Amended CodeCitation Text
73053-8-6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback