IL SB0687 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Veterans Burial Places Act. Provides that when a headstone or memorial marker is provided for a United States War Veteran pursuant to specified federal law by the federal government, the Department of Veterans' Affairs shall pay an amount not to exceed $300 (currently, $100) to the next of kin or cemetery official responsible for the cost of transporting and erecting the headstone or memorial. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VETERANS BURIAL PLACES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-02-16SenatePostponed - Veterans Affairs
2017-02-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-02-01SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2017-01-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-26SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3301101.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback